Global Patent Index - EP 0977234 A3

EP 0977234 A3 2000-11-15 - Trip device for a ground fault circuit breaker and circuit for controlling the same

Title (en)

Trip device for a ground fault circuit breaker and circuit for controlling the same

Title (de)

Auslöseeinrichtung für einen Fehlerstromschutzschalter und Schaltungsanordnung zur Ansteuerung derselben

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déclenchement pour un disjoncteur à courant de défaut et circuit de commande approprié

Publication

EP 0977234 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99113505 A

Priority

DE 19833829 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0977234A2] Circuit breaker has trip with magnetic drive arrangement. Area between yoke legs (12,14) has magnetic actuator (25) which has second permanent magnet (26) and coil (27). If faulty current occurs, extra coil impacts armature of trip. Bistable actuator is used as magnetic drive, providing sufficient energy to overcome adhesion force armature and pole surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 83/14; H01H 71/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/144 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977234 A2 20000202; EP 0977234 A3 20001115; DE 19833829 A1 20000203

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030203

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR

2001-08-01 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19990728

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990728

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01H 83/14 A, 7H 01H 71/32 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990728