Global patent index - EP 0977303 A2

EP 0977303 A2 2000-02-02 - Antenna for radio telephone

Title (en)

Antenna for radio telephone

Title (de)

Antenne für Funkgerät

Title (fr)

Antenne pour appareil radio

Publication

EP 0977303 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99114696 A

Priority

  • JP 21153498 A
  • JP 19290699 A

Abstract (en)

Provides an antenna for a radio telephone whereby, in a state wherein a rod-shaped antenna (10) is extended to outside the case (50) of the radio telephone, the effects of the human body are negligible and emission of radio waves at an angle close to the horizontal direction is possible, and in a state wherein the rod-shaped antenna (10) is retracted within the case (50), no unwanted radiation is produced. For this purpose, a helical antenna (20) having an electrical length of lambda /4 and the rod-shaped antenna (10) extendable and retractable with respect to the case (50) through the hollow central portion of the helical antenna (20) and having an electrical length of about 3 lambda /8 and inductive reactance, are electrically coupled by means of an electrostatic coupling portion (30) having capacitive reactance such that, in the state wherein the rod-shaped antenna (10) is extended from the case (50), the inductive reactance of the rod-shaped antenna (10) is canceled out. The length of the bottom portion (12a) of the connecting member (12) is preferably set to a length such that when the rod-shaped antenna (10) is retracted within the case (50), the bottom portion (12a) of the connecting member (12) passes through the helical coil (20) over the entire length thereof, severing electrical coupling between the helical antenna (20) and the rod-shaped antenna (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/24; H01Q 1/08; H01Q 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/08 (2006.01); H01Q 1/22 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/244 (2013.01); H01Q 1/084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977303 A2 20000202; EP 0977303 A3 20030409; CN 1205695 C 20050608; CN 1250237 A 20000412; JP 2000106502 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status

2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031010

2004-02-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI