Global Patent Index - EP 0977305 A2

EP 0977305 A2 2000-02-02 - Electromagnetic transparent compound window for target tracking supersonic and hypersonic missiles

Title (en)

Electromagnetic transparent compound window for target tracking supersonic and hypersonic missiles

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisch durchlässiges Verbundfenster für zielverfolgende Über- und Hyperschall-Flugkörper

Title (fr)

Fenêtre composée perméable aux rayonnements électromagnétiques pour missile supersonique et hypersonique pour suiveur de cible

Publication

EP 0977305 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112424 A

Priority

DE 19833884 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19833884C1] The search head for a missile has an electromagnetically transparent window with superimposed multiple panels (12,14). The panels have a material, thickness and temperature dependent mechanical tension for super or hyper sonic flight reduced in comparison to a completely homogenous window .

Abstract (de)

Bei einem für elektromagnetische Strahlung durchlässigen Fenster bei einem zielverfolgenden Über- oder Hyperschall-Flugkörper besteht das Fenster aus mehreren gemeinsam gehaltene, einander stützende Fensterschichten (12,14), deren Materialwahl, Dicke und Anordnung temperaturbedingte mechanische Spannungen bei Über- oder Hyperschallflug im Vergleich zu einem durchgehend homogenen Fenster reduziert. Bei einer Ausführung sind die Fensterschichten auf ihren aneinandergrenzenden Oberflächen fest miteinander verbunden und bestehen aus Materialien mit derart unterschiedlichen thermischen Ausdehnungs-Koeffizienten, daß sich bei dem während des Über- oder Hyperschallfluges durch das Fenster hindurch auftretenden Temperaturgradienten in den verschiedenen Fensterschichten im wesentlichen gleiche thermische Ausdehnungen ergeben.Eine weitere Maßnahme besteht darin, daß zwischen den Fensterschichten (12,14) eine Gleitschicht vorhanden ist, die eine Relativbewegung der Fensterschichten parallel zu ihren aneinandergrenzenden Oberflächen gestattet, so daß die Übertragung der Spannungen zwischen den Fensterschichten (12,14) vermindert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/42; H01Q 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/46 (2006.01); F42B 15/34 (2006.01); H01Q 1/28 (2006.01); H01Q 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/46 (2013.01); F42B 15/34 (2013.01); H01Q 1/28 (2013.01); H01Q 1/422 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833884 C1 19991223; EP 0977305 A2 20000202; EP 0977305 A3 20020213; IL 130997 A 20031210; IL 130997 D0 20010128; US 6273362 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO.KG

2002-12-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-11-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI