Global Patent Index - EP 0977307 A1

EP 0977307 A1 2000-02-02 - Multiple-antenna structure, in particular for satellite and ground installations

Title (en)

Multiple-antenna structure, in particular for satellite and ground installations

Title (de)

Antennenstruktur mit mehreren Antennen, insbesondere für Satelliten- und Bodeninstallationen

Title (fr)

Structure d' antenne à multiple antennes, en particulier pour installations au sol et satellite

Publication

EP 0977307 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202064 A

Priority

IT MI981779 A

Abstract (en)

A multiple-antenna structure (11), in particular for satellite and ground installations, of the type having at least one output and if necessary provided with external protection, comprising at least one first radiating element (12) and at least one second radiating element (13) designed to operate substantially in different frequency bands, the first radiating element (12) and the second radiating element (13) being electromagnetically decoupled from one another and having radiation planes which are substantially mutually perpendicular. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/04; H01Q 9/36; H01Q 21/28; H01Q 21/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 9/36 (2006.01); H01Q 21/28 (2006.01); H01Q 21/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/30 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0407 (2013.01); H01Q 9/36 (2013.01); H01Q 21/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977307 A1 20000202; IT 1301886 B1 20000707; IT MI981779 A1 20000131; IT MI981779 D0 19980730

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031003

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010316

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000519;LT PAYMENT 20000519;LV PAYMENT 20000519;MK PAYMENT 20000519;RO PAYMENT 20000519;SI PAYMENT 20000519

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI