Global patent index - EP 0977314 A1

EP 0977314 A1 2000-02-02 - Plug connector with right-angle contacts

Title (en)

Plug connector with right-angle contacts

Title (de)

Steckverbinder mit rechtwinkligen Kontakten

Title (fr)

Connecteur à fiche ayant des contacts à angle droit

Publication

EP 0977314 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113110 A

Priority

DE 19834478 A

Abstract (en)

A plug-in connector (15) has several contact elements fitted inside a case (21) with a first connector terminal (18) for a plug and a second connector terminal (19) fitted at an angle over an adapter (2) for a plug-in connection with through hole plated drilled holes (17) in a printed circuit board (14). The second connector terminal is slotted on axis for a springy radial fit in a through hole plated drilled hole. An access limiter (23) is slotted in a plug-in direction.

Abstract (de)

Ein Steckverbinder (15) besitzt mehrere Kontaktelemente (11), die innerhalb eines Gehäuses (21) des Steckverbinders (15) mit einem ersten Anschlussende (18) bspw. für einen Stecker und diesem abgewandt mit einem zweiten Anschlussende (19) zum einsteckbaren Verbinden mit durchkontaktierten Bohrungen (17) in einer Leiterplatte (14) oder dgl. versehen sind, wobei das zweite Anschlussende (19) zur radial federnden Aufnahme in der durchkontaktierten Bohrung (17) axial geschlitzt ist, und ein Wegbegrenzungselement (23) in Einsteckrichtung. Damit zur steckbaren Verbindung mit einer Leiterplatte (14) weniger Raum oberhalb der Leiterplatte beansprucht und dennoch eine sichere Verbindung mit der Leiterplatte erreicht wird, ist vorgesehen, dass das leiterplattenseitige zweite Anschlussende (19) des Kontaktelementes (11) über ein Adapterteil (20) winklig, vorzugsweise rechtwinklig zum steckerseitigen ersten Anschlussende (18) angeordnet ist und dass am Gehäuse (21) oder Leiterplatte (14) das Wegbegrenzungselement (23) vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/06 (2006.01); H01R 12/50 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/06 (2013.01); H01R 12/716 (2013.01); H01R 12/724 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977314 A1 20000202; EP 0977314 B1 20070919; DE 19834478 A1 20000217; DE 59914508 D1 20071031; US 6264474 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59914508

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080523

2008-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080620

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070919

2008-05-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2007-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914508

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-10-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2007-09-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050519

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI