Global patent index - EP 0977321 A1

EP 0977321 A1 2000-02-02 - Two-part electrical connector housing

Title (en)

Two-part electrical connector housing

Title (de)

Zweiteiliges elektrisches Verbindergehäuse

Title (fr)

Boîtier en deux parties pour des connecteurs électriques

Publication

EP 0977321 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202103 A

Priority

DE 19834203 A

Abstract (en)

A two-part housing (10) for an electrical connector comprising a first part (12) having a surface (40) with an opening (38) therethrough, and a second part (14) having a substantially rigid arm (20) extending from a surface (62) of the second part, the rigid arm being capable of passing through the opening to latch the first and second parts together; the rigid arm having a first side (22) and a second side (24), the first side having a first tab (26) with a first surface (30) directed towards the surface of the second part and a second surface (32) directed away from the surface of the second part, the second surface being at an angle to the first side; the first part having a wall (42) adjacent the opening and extending away from the surface, the wall having a first tab (44) with a first surface (48) directed towards the opening and a second surface (50) directed away from the opening, the first surface being at an angle to the wall; the first surface of the first tab on the wall engaging the second surface on the first tab on the rigid arm during latching of the first and second parts, and the second surface of the first tab on the wall being positioned adjacent the first surface on the first tab on the rigid arm after latching of the first and second parts; and a resilient arm (56) positioned on the opposite side of the opening to the wall and overlying the first tab on the wall, the resilient arm engaging the second side of the rigid arm during and after latching of the first and second parts to bias the first side of the rigid arm towards the wall. Ensures positive latching of the first and second parts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/506

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/506 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/506 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977321 A1 20000202; DE 19834203 A1 20000203

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100105

2007-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061013

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061013

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI