Global Patent Index - EP 0977478 A1

EP 0977478 A1 2000-02-09 - ANIMAL HUSBANDRY SYSTEM

Title (en)

ANIMAL HUSBANDRY SYSTEM

Title (de)

TIERZUCHT VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ELEVAGE DE BETAIL

Publication

EP 0977478 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98919802 A

Priority

  • US 9807916 W
  • US 84354197 A
  • US 5146597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847351A1] An animal husbandry system comprising an electronic identification device (100) carried by an animal and a signal receiving device (105) generally adjacent to the animal whereby the electronic identification device (100) produces an identification signal including information about the animal and the signal receiving device (105) receives the signal thereby facilitating the care and management of the animal, wherein the electronic identification device (100) has magnetic properties and may be adapted to deliver a substance to the animal and may assist in determining feed conversion efficiency.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01K 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 11/00 (2006.01); A01K 13/00 (2006.01); A01K 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 13/003 (2013.01); A01K 11/00 (2013.01); A01K 11/007 (2013.01); A01K 29/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847351 A1 19981029; AU 7250998 A 19981113; CA 2329906 A1 19981029; EP 0977478 A1 20000209; EP 0977478 A4 20020130

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20030223

2002-01-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011213

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 01K 29/00 A, 7A 01K 11/00 B, 7A 01K 13/00 B

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAYES, NORMAN J.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAYES, NORMAN, J.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TROESCH, PETER

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LINSETH, GERRY, S.

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991118

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991118;LT PAYMENT 19991118;LV PAYMENT 19991118;MK PAYMENT 19991118;RO PAYMENT 19991118;SI PAYMENT 19991118