Global Patent Index - EP 0977482 A1

EP 0977482 A1 2000-02-09 - IDENTIFICATION OF POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING NOVEL $i(HELICOBACTER) POLYPEPTIDES IN THE $i(HELICOBACTER) GENOME

Title (en)

IDENTIFICATION OF POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING NOVEL $i(HELICOBACTER) POLYPEPTIDES IN THE $i(HELICOBACTER) GENOME

Title (de)

IDENTIFICATION VON POLYNUKLEOTIDEN, DIE NEUE $i(HELIOBACTER) POLYPEPTIDE IM $i(HELIOBACTER) GENOM KODIEREN

Title (fr)

IDENTIFICATION DE POLYNUCLEOTIDES CODANT DE NOUVEAUX POLYPEPTIDES $i(HELICOBACTER) DANS LE GENOME $i(HELICOBACTER)

Publication

EP 0977482 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917972 A

Priority

  • US 9806371 W
  • US 83345797 A
  • US 88122797 A
  • US 90261597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9843478A1] The invention provides Helicobacter polypeptides that can be used in vaccination methods for preventing or treating Helicobacter infection, and polynucleotides that encode these polypeptides. The invention also provides diagnostic methods employing these polypeptides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 43/04; A61K 31/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/205 (2006.01); C07K 16/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/121 (2013.01); C07K 14/205 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9843478 A1 19981008; AU 7099598 A 19981022; AU 756010 B2 20030102; CA 2286306 A1 19981008; CN 1263436 A 20000816; EP 0977482 A1 20000209; EP 0977482 A4 20020306; JP 2001527393 A 20011225; NZ 338039 A 20010427

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041214

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040602

2002-03-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020122

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/32 A, 7C 07K 14/205 B, 7A 01N 43/04 B, 7A 61K 31/70 B

2000-04-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: IDENTIFICATION OF POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING NOVEL HELICOBACTER POLYPEPTIDES IN THE HELICOBACTER GENOME

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991102

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE