Global patent index - EP 0977520 A1

EP 0977520 A1 2000-02-09 - ELECTRICALLY DRIVEN DENTAL SCALING APPARATUS

Title (en)

ELECTRICALLY DRIVEN DENTAL SCALING APPARATUS

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCH BETRIEBENES ZAHNREINIGUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE DE DETARTRAGE

Publication

EP 0977520 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924150 A

Priority

  • EP 9802310 W
  • US 4414897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847443A1] Disclosed is an electrically driven dental scaling apparatus, comprising a handle fitted with a drive unit. The handle can be joined to an adapter piece fitted with a scaling tool. Said scaling tool can be rotated by the drive unit. A first scaling tool of a first adapter piece can be directly coupled to the drive unit. A second scaling tool (22, 40, 60) of a second adapter piece (10) can be coupled to the drive gear by means of a mechanism.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61C 17/26; A46B 9/04; A46B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/04 (2006.01); A46B 11/00 (2006.01); A61C 17/26 (2006.01); A61C 17/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/005 (2013.01); A46B 9/045 (2013.01); A46B 11/0006 (2013.01); A61C 17/26 (2013.01); A46B 2200/108 (2013.01); A61C 17/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847443A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847443 A1 19981029; AU 7645598 A 19981113; EP 0977520 A1 20000209; US 6253404 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021224

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRAUN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020812

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991002

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE