Global patent index - EP 0977595 A4

EP 0977595 A4 2001-05-16 - PREVENTION OF GRAFT-VERSUS-HOST DISEASE WITH T-CELLS INCLUDING POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING NEGATIVE SELECTIVE MARKERS

Title (en)

PREVENTION OF GRAFT-VERSUS-HOST DISEASE WITH T-CELLS INCLUDING POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING NEGATIVE SELECTIVE MARKERS

Title (de)

VERHÜTUNG VON TRANSPLANTAT/EMPFÄNGER KRANKHEITEN MITTELS T-ZELLEN, WELCHE POLYNUKLEINSÄUREN FÜR NEGATIVE SELEKTIONSMARKER BEINHALTEN

Title (fr)

PREVENTION DE LA REACTION DU GREFFON CONTRE L'HOTE AU MOYEN DE LYMPHOCYTES THYMO-DEPENDANTS CONTENANT DES POLYNUCLEOTIDES CODANT DES MARQUEURS DE SELECTION NEGATIVE

Publication

EP 0977595 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97925747 A

Priority

  • US 9709040 W
  • US 65645196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9745142A1] A method of preventing graft-versus-host disease in a patient being treated for relapsed or persistent leukemia. The method comprises administering to a host allogeneic T-cells genetically engineered to include a polynucleotide encoding a negative selective marker. Prior to the occurrence of graft-versus-host disease, an interaction or chemotherapeutic agent is administered to the host, which kills the genetically engineered T-cells, thereby preventing the occurrence of graft-versus-host disease. Such method also may be employed in connection with the treatment of any disease or disorder wherein the treatment includes bone marrow ablation followed by the administration of a T-cell depleted bone marrow transplant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 48/00; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/85

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/52 (2006.01); A61K 31/522 (2006.01); A61K 35/14 (2006.01); A61K 35/26 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/08 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/001 (2013.01); A61K 31/522 (2013.01); A61K 35/17 (2013.01); A61K 35/28 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5156 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 31/522 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] TIBERGIEN P ET AL: "GANCICLOVIR TREATMENT OF HERPES SIMPLEX THYMIDINE KINASE-TRANSDUCEDPRIMARY T LYMPHOCYTES: AN APPROACH FOR SPECIFIC IN VIVO DONOR T-CELL DEPLETION AFTER BONE MARROW TRANSPLANTATION?", BLOOD,US,W.B. SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, VA, vol. 84, no. 4, 15 August 1994 (1994-08-15), pages 1333 - 1341, XP000566470, ISSN: 0006-4971
  • [Y] MULLEN C A: "Metabolic suicide genes in gene therapy.", PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, (1994 AUG) 63 (2) 199-207. REF: 35, XP000566391
  • See also references of WO 9745142A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9745142 A1 19971204; AU 3079697 A 19980105; AU 719930 B2 20000518; CA 2255941 A1 19971204; EP 0977595 A1 20000209; EP 0977595 A4 20010516; IL 127211 D0 19990922; JP 2000511539 A 20000905; NO 985522 A 19990125; NO 985522 D0 19981126; NZ 333053 A 20000623

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-05-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981218

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 19981218;SI PAYMENT 19981218