Global patent index - EP 0977598 A1

EP 0977598 A1 2000-02-09 - NMR IMAGE COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

NMR IMAGE COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGENFÜR NMR BILDUMGEBUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSE D'IMAGERIE RMV

Publication

EP 0977598 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917437 A

Priority

  • GB 9801173 W
  • GB 9708108 A
  • US 5028397 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847539A1] The invention relates to the use as a contrast agent in MR imaging of a substance which has a first and a second relaxivity state, which has relaxivities differing by a factor of at least 5 in said first and second states, and which is convertible in vivo from said first to said second state whereby contrast is enhanced in a body region in which conversion to said second electronic state does or does not occur.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 49/00 (2006.01); A61B 5/055 (2006.01); A61K 41/00 (2006.01); A61K 49/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 41/0071 (2013.01); A61K 49/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847539A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847539 A1 19981029; AU 7066698 A 19981113; EP 0977598 A1 20000209; JP 2001524095 A 20011127

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020506

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMERSHAM HEALTH AS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NYCOMED IMAGING AS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991028

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT