Global Patent Index - EP 0977636 A1

EP 0977636 A1 2000-02-09 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING DISPERSIONS ON A STRIP OF MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING DISPERSIONS ON A STRIP OF MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON DISPERSIONEN AUF EINE MATERIALBAHN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR APPLIQUER DES DISPERSIONS SUR UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU

Publication

EP 0977636 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924149 A

Priority

  • DE 19716466 A
  • EP 9802307 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19716466A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for applying a dispersion on a running strip of material, wherein the dispersion is applied on a strip in a free-falling curtain by a slotted nozzle (3) placed above the strip (1) and extending transversally to the direction of movement of the strip. The method and the device are used preferably in installations for the production of adhesive materials to apply a dispersion adhesive and for the production of moisture-resisting packing materials to apply a barrier layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/30; B05C 5/00; D21H 23/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/00 (2006.01); B05D 1/30 (2006.01); D21H 23/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/48 (2013.01); B05C 5/005 (2013.01); B05D 1/305 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847630A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716466 A1 19981022; AT 231747 T 20030215; CN 1140357 C 20040303; CN 1252741 A 20000510; DK 0977636 T3 20030623; EP 0977636 A1 20000209; EP 0977636 B1 20030129; ES 2191937 T3 20030916; JP 2000510389 A 20000815; WO 9847630 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 231747 T

- Effective date: 20160818

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20030129

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20030129

2016-11-09 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20160818

2016-10-14 [REG CH PLX] PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-18 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59807071

2016-08-18 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 59807071

2016-07-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TSE TROLLER SCHWEIZER ENGINEERING AG

- Effective date: 20031029

2016-07-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: POLYTYPE S.A.

- Effective date: 20031029

2016-06-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TSE TROLLER SCHWEIZER ENGINEERING AG

- Effective date: 20031029

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: POLYTYPE S.A.

- Effective date: 20031029

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KROENERT GMBH & CO. KG

2014-04-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KROENERT GMBH & CO KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BACHOFEN + MEIER AG MASCHINENFABRIK, BUELACH, CH

- Document: DE 59807071

- Effective date: 20140305

2014-04-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59807071

- Representative's name: JAESCHKE, RAINER, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20140305

2014-03-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59807071

- Representative's name: JAESCHKE, RAINER, DIPL.-ING., DE

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BACHOFEN + MEIER AG MASCHINENFABRIK

- Free text: BACHOFEN + MEIER AG MASCHINENFABRIK#AN DER FELDSTRASSE 60#CH-8180 BUELACH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- BACHOFEN + MEIER AG MASCHINENFABRIK#AN DER FELDSTRASSE 60#CH-8180 BUELACH (CH)

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-12-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BACHOFEN + MEIER A.G. MASCHINENFABRIK

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-04-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-04-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-04-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-04-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TSE TROLLER SCHWEIZER ENGINEERING AG

2004-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: POLYTYPE S.A.

2004-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TSE TROLLER SCHWEIZER ENGINEERING AG

- Effective date: 20031029

2004-01-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: POLYTYPE S.A.

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191937 T3

2003-09-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-05-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-04 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030404

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030403

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-03 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030403

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030402

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-01 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030401

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030328

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030325

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807071 P 20030306

2003-03-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990825

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE