Global patent index - EP 0977638 A1

EP 0977638 A1 2000-02-09 - STEEL WIRE SHEATHED IN ELASTOMER MATERIAL FOR SCREEN CLOTH AND SCREEN CLOTH INCORPORATING SAME

Title (en)

STEEL WIRE SHEATHED IN ELASTOMER MATERIAL FOR SCREEN CLOTH AND SCREEN CLOTH INCORPORATING SAME

Title (de)

MIT ELASTOMEREM MATERIAL UMHÜLLTER STAHLDRAHT FÜR EIN SIEBGEWEBE UND SIEBGEWEBE MIT EINEM SOLCHEN DRAHT

Title (fr)

FIL D'ACIER GAINE D'UNE MATIERE ELASTOMERE POUR TOILE DE CRIBLAGE ET TOILE DE CRIBLAGE INCORPORANT UN TEL FIL

Publication

EP 0977638 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98921575 A

Priority

  • FR 9800798 W
  • FR 9704906 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762253A1] The invention concerns a steel wire (1) sheathed in an elastomer material, comprising an elastomer protective coating (2) with a transverse cross section inscribed in a rectangle (4) whereof the height is not less than the width. The steel wire (3) is eccentrically placed inside said protective coating (2) and is located nearer the bottom surface than the top surface of said coating (2). The sheathed steel wire (1) is useful for making screen cloths.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/4609 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847633A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762253 A1 19981023; FR 2762253 B1 19990709; AU 7437898 A 19981113; DE 69810458 D1 20030206; DE 69810458 T2 20031023; EP 0977638 A1 20000209; EP 0977638 B1 20030102; ES 2190077 T3 20030716; WO 9847633 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160408

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69810458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69810458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2190077

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69810458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: 20030102:NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020220

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990929

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT