Global patent index - EP 0977639 A1

EP 0977639 A1 2000-02-09 - TEMPORARY STORE FOR GOODS

Title (en)

TEMPORARY STORE FOR GOODS

Title (de)

ZWISCHENSPEICHER FÜR GÜTER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE STOCKAGE TEMPORAIRE POUR OBJETS

Publication

EP 0977639 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97924983 A

Priority

  • DE 19624968 A
  • EP 9702667 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19624968C1] The invention relates to a temporary store for goods, preferably packets, large letters, periodicals and the like, making use of square containers for said goods which are open on at least one side, circulate and are moved in the direction of the perpendicular to the surface of a large-area longitudinal side, with a loading station in which the goods are transported laterally and horizontally in the containers, and an unloading station in which the goods are removed from the containers sideways. According to the invention, there are only one endless, continuously moving traction mechanism and guided circulating containers with releasable couplings for securing the container concerned to and releasing it from the traction mechanism. Here, the containers are released from the traction mechanism by fixed-position shifting components pivoted into the conveyance path of the containers or by contact with the container in front and recoupled to the traction mechanism as the shifting components are pivoted out of the conveyance path of the containers or as the container in front is conveyed further.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 1/025 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4476 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2301/4476 + B65H 2220/01 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9749501A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19624968 C1 19980115; EP 0977639 A1 20000209; EP 0977639 B1 20020828; WO 9749501 A1 19971231

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080524

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090119

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR IT LI

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981204

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR IT LI