Global patent index - EP 0977654 A1

EP 0977654 A1 2000-02-09 - HAND PLANER

Title (en)

HAND PLANER

Title (de)

HANDHOBELMASCHINE

Title (fr)

RABOT A MAIN

Publication

EP 0977654 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928065 A

Priority

  • DE 9800869 W
  • DE 19717706 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19717706A1] The invention relates to a hand planer (10) with a housing (12) that rotationally lodges a plane shaft (21) having at least one longitudinal slot (46). A plane knife (21), detachably clamped in the longitudinal slot (46), is configured as a mini-turnover board having at least one standard blade and one rear groove (35) for engagement of a supporting rib (37) in the longitudinal slot (46) of the plane shaft (21). This shaft (20) has at least one radial limit stop (50) for positioning the standard blade (22) of the plane knife (21) on an intended circular trajectory. In order to simplify said hand planer (10), the plane knife (21) has only one active blade (22) with troughs (39) and crests (38). The troughs (39) lie on a common first straight line (u) which is the same parallel distance from the rear groove (35) as standard blades of straight mini-turnover boards. The wave crests (38) lie on a second common straight line (o) which runs 0.5 to 1.5 mm above the first straight line (u). The plane knife (21) has a flat bearing edge (36) on the side opposite the first blade (22), which edge rests against the radial limit stop (50) of the plane shaft (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27G 13/04; B27G 13/12; B27M 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27G 13/04 (2006.01); B27G 13/12 (2006.01); B27M 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27G 13/12 (2013.01); B27G 13/04 (2013.01); B27M 1/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848985A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19717706 A1 19981029; CN 1089053 C 20020814; CN 1253520 A 20000517; EP 0977654 A1 20000209; EP 0977654 B1 20020313; JP 2002508716 A 20020319; US 6249982 B1 20010626; WO 9848985 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050325

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-10-23 [REG GB 710B] REQUEST OF ALTER TIME LIMITS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 710B

- Free Format Text: THIS PATENT WAS ANNOUNCED AS VOID IN THE PATENTS AND DESIGNS JOURNAL NO. 5912 DATED 20020911.

2002-09-25 [REG GB 710B] REQUEST OF ALTER TIME LIMITS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 710B

- Free Format Text: APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF THE PERIOD(S) PRESCRIBED BY RULE(S) SCHEDULE 4 PARA 2 FILED ON 20020827.

2002-05-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020507

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803341

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-03-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT