Global Patent Index - EP 0977667 A1

EP 0977667 A1 2000-02-09 - MULTICOLOR SHEET OFFSET PRINTING MACHINE WITH AN IMAGING DEVICE AND A CLEANING DEVICE AND PAPER THICKNESS ADJUSTMENT

Title (en)

MULTICOLOR SHEET OFFSET PRINTING MACHINE WITH AN IMAGING DEVICE AND A CLEANING DEVICE AND PAPER THICKNESS ADJUSTMENT

Title (de)

MEHRFARBENBOGENOFFSETDRUCKMASCHINE MIT BEBILDERUNGS- UND REINIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG SOWIE PAPIERDICKEN EINSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

MACHINE D'IMPRESSION OFFSET MULTICOLORE A FEUILLES AVEC DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGE, UN DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE ET REGLAGE DE L'EPAISSEUR DU PAPIER

Publication

EP 0977667 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98931908 A

Priority

  • DE 9801044 W
  • DE 19715241 A
  • DE 19715242 A
  • DE 19715243 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846427A1] The invention relates to a printing machine with at least one integrated device to print a printed form from a printing cylinder. The aim of the invention is to create a printing machine with a compact design. This is achieved by arranging the cylinder groups (11) symmetrically in relation to a horizontal alpha bisecting line (12) of an angle ( alpha ) formed by the connecting lines of the centers of the offset cylinders (9) with the center of the printing cylinder (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 7/10; B41C 1/00; B41F 7/02; B41F 13/36; B41F 35/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/02 (2006.01); B41F 7/10 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01); B41F 35/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41F 7/02 (2013.01); B41F 7/10 (2013.01); B41F 35/006 (2013.01); B41F 35/06 (2013.01); B41P 2227/70 (2013.01); B41P 2235/22 (2013.01); B41P 2235/242 (2013.01); B41P 2235/246 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846427A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846427 A1 19981022; EP 0977667 A1 20000209; EP 0977667 B1 20020327

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090409

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090409

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080412

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803516

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-02

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-03-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JENTZSCH, ARNDT

2002-03-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NERGER, REINHARD

2002-03-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PSCHEIDL, MICHAEL

2002-03-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BECKER, UWE

2002-03-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KESSLER, VOLKER

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991108

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB