Global Patent Index - EP 0977669 A1

EP 0977669 A1 2000-02-09 - METHOD FOR MAKING A FILM WITH PATTERN PREVENTING REPRODUCTION BY OPTICAL SCANNING FOR THE PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING A FILM WITH PATTERN PREVENTING REPRODUCTION BY OPTICAL SCANNING FOR THE PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES FILMS MIT NICHT WIEDERGABEFÄHIGEN MUSTERN DURCH OPTISCHES AUSLESEN ZUM SCHUTZ VON DOKUMENTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN FILM A MOTIF NON REPRODUCTIBLE PAR LECTURE OPTIQUE POUR LA PROTECTION DE DOCUMENTS

Publication

EP 0977669 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98921569 A

Priority

  • FR 9800792 W
  • FR 9705101 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762336A1] The invention concerns a film (7a) produced by printing on a top sheet (1) with non-glossy surface (2), a first glossy varnish imprint (3) adhering on said surface (2). A second continuous imprint produced on the first, adheres neither on the top sheet (1) nor on the varnish (3), and the film (7a) is completed. A glossy imprint (9) is thus provided in the film (7a) external surface (8) which is then applied on a document (12) to protect it from being reproduced by optical scanning.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 3/14; B42D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 3/14 (2013.01); B42D 25/29 (2014.10); Y10S 283/901 (2013.01); Y10S 283/902 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847714A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762336 A1 19981023; FR 2762336 B1 19990611; AT 214001 T 20020315; CA 2286088 A1 19981029; CA 2286088 C 20080722; DE 69804088 D1 20020411; DE 69804088 T2 20021114; EP 0977669 A1 20000209; EP 0977669 B1 20020306; ES 2173579 T3 20021016; US 2002027362 A1 20020307; US 6336666 B1 20020108; US 6543810 B2 20030408; WO 9847714 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160325

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160405

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20150403

2015-05-08 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150403

2015-05-01 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Effective date: 20150204

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-11-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140420

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FASVER SA,

- Free text: FASVER SA,#ZAE LA BISTE II 286 RUE CHARLES GIDE#34670 BAILLARGUES (FR) -TRANSFER TO- FASVER SA,#ZAE LA BISTE II 286 RUE CHARLES GIDE#34670 BAILLARGUES (FR)

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2173579 T3

2002-10-02 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-06-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-06-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-06-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-04-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804088 20020411

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214001 T 20020315

2002-02-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TRANTOUL, FRANCOIS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FASVER SA,

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FASVER SA,

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990927

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE