Global Patent Index - EP 0977690 A1

EP 0977690 A1 2000-02-09 - PACKAGE, ASSEMBLY OF BLANKS, METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PACKAGING AN ARTICLES OR A GROUP OF ARTICLES OF INDEFINITE VOLUME

Title (en)

PACKAGE, ASSEMBLY OF BLANKS, METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PACKAGING AN ARTICLES OR A GROUP OF ARTICLES OF INDEFINITE VOLUME

Title (de)

VERPACKUNG FÜR EIN PRODUKT ODER EINER MENGE ARTIKELN NICHTSPEZIFISCHER FORM, SATZ VON ZUSCHNITTEN, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN VERPACKUNG

Title (fr)

EMBALLAGE, ENSEMBLE DE FLANS, PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE CONDITIONNEMENT D'UN ARTICLE OU D'UN LOT D'ARTICLES DE VOLUME INDETERMINE

Publication

EP 0977690 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98922870 A

Priority

  • FR 9800834 W
  • FR 9705092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762586A1] The invention concerns a box, an assembly of blanks, a method and a device for making a packaging box to transport a load. The box comprises a bottom, at least four side walls, viz. two first opposite walls and two second opposite walls, a heat-shrinkable plastic film (13) designed for packaging and maintaining the load (24) and means for fixing said film on the box bottom comprising a plate (14) mounted horizontal, for pressing and maintaining the heat-shrinkable film on the box bottom inner surface. The plate comprises a median or substantially median line for its provisional longitudinal cone-shaped folding, with a ridge (209) directed towards the box top, said median line being parallel to the two second walls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/50; B31B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 7/00 (2006.01); B65D 5/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/5028 (2013.01); B31B 2105/00 (2017.08); B31B 2120/402 (2017.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762586 A1 19981030; FR 2762586 B1 19990716; AU 7535598 A 19981113; CA 2287497 A1 19981029; DE 69811359 D1 20030320; DE 69811359 T2 20030904; DE 69813315 D1 20030515; DE 69813315 T2 20040212; EP 0977690 A1 20000209; EP 0977690 B1 20030212; EP 1188676 A1 20020320; EP 1188676 B1 20030409; JP 2001524054 A 20011127; JP 3990466 B2 20071010; US 6264034 B1 20010724; WO 9847774 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69811359 P 20030320

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CARDBOARD BOX FOR PACKAGING A GROUP OF ARTICLES

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991122

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL