Global Patent Index - EP 0977700 A2

EP 0977700 A2 2000-02-09 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CROSS-FOLDING SIGNATURES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CROSS-FOLDING SIGNATURES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM QUERFALZEN VON SIGNATUREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE PLIAGE TRANSVERSAL DE CAHIERS D'IMPRIMERIE

Publication

EP 0977700 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98931960 A

Priority

  • DE 9801107 W
  • DE 19716628 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19716628A1] The invention relates to a method and device for cross-folding signatures for both thin and thick folded products, without damaging said products. According to the invention, the signatures are pressed into a pre-folding, gripping element system by means of a folding blade. The pre-folding, gripping element system picks up the signatures to form a pre-fold. The pre-folded product is then retained, transported and conveyed to a pair of rotating folding rollers for the folds to be completed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/60 (2006.01); B65H 45/16 (2006.01); B65H 45/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/163 (2013.01); B65H 45/166 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847804A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716628 A1 19981029; DE 19716628 C2 20001123; EP 0977700 A2 20000209; EP 0977700 B1 20010711; JP 2000510427 A 20000815; RU 2184071 C2 20020627; US 6234947 B1 20010522; WO 9847804 A2 19981029; WO 9847804 A3 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070421

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080421

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080421

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070419

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070417

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801003 20010816

2001-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-07-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991117

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI