Global Patent Index - EP 0977702 A1

EP 0977702 A1 2000-02-09 - CONTAINER CLOSURE

Title (en)

CONTAINER CLOSURE

Title (de)

BEHÄLTERVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE BOUCHAGE DE RECIPIENT

Publication

EP 0977702 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98921481 A

Priority

  • DE 19717619 A
  • EP 9802382 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849090A1] The invention relates to a container closure used for filling and emptying containers, specially barrel-shaped transport drums, which can be interchangeably inserted into a container opening receiving a bung head (1). The container closure has an ascending tube (2) connected to the bung head and a connecting piece for withdrawal (3) which can be closed by the bung head using a pin coding system which has coding pins (4', 4") and matching coding recesses (5', 5"). According to the invention, the coding pins (4', 4") are arranged on a first fixing member (7) and the coding recesses (5', 5") are arranged on second fixing member (1). One of the fixing members is configured as a ring-shaped disc (7) which can be separately and loosely mounted on the modular connecting piece for withdrawal (3) in such a way that it cannot be slipped off. The inventive container closure prevents chemicals from being mixed up, enables simultaneous removal of liquid and ventilation and can be assembled on conventional containers or barrels while fully complying with regulations on hazardous goods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/33; B67D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/08 (2006.01); B67D 7/02 (2010.01); B67D 7/34 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/0288 (2013.01); B67D 1/0802 (2013.01); B67D 1/0829 (2013.01); B67D 7/344 (2013.01); B65D 2231/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849090A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849090 A1 19981105; AT 207852 T 20011115; AU 7431698 A 19981124; DK 0977702 T3 20020211; EP 0977702 A1 20000209; EP 0977702 B1 20011031; ES 2167076 T3 20020501; KR 100558084 B1 20060310; MY 132940 A 20071031; PT 977702 E 20020429; TW 442431 B 20010623; US 6357494 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170418

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020422

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RIEDEL-DE HAEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050423

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-11-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RIEDEL-DE HAEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050423

2005-04-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050423

2005-04-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-06-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-07 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040507

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040423

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040402

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2004-01-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-02-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167076 T3

2002-04-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020122

2002-04-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020422

2002-04-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020422

2002-04-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020422

2002-04-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020422

2002-04-22 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020422

2002-03-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-02-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-02-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801967 20011206

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 207852 T 20011115

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE