Global patent index - EP 0977717 A1

EP 0977717 A1 2000-02-09 - PRODUCTION OF ENANTIOMER-FREE BIARYLKETOCARBOXYLIC ACIDS

Title (en)

PRODUCTION OF ENANTIOMER-FREE BIARYLKETOCARBOXYLIC ACIDS

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG ENANTIOMERENREINER BIARYLKETOCARBONSÄUREN

Title (fr)

PREPARATION D'ACIDES BIARYLCETOCARBOXYLIQUES EXEMPTS D'ENANTIOMERES

Publication

EP 0977717 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98922707 A

Priority

  • DE 19717429 A
  • EP 9802176 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849124A1] The invention relates to a novel method for producing enantiomer-free biarylketocarboxylic acids, whereby S-phenylethylamine is used as an auxiliary base in racemate resolution. Biarylketocarboxylic acids, specially substituted biaryl-4-ketocarboxylic acids, are inhibitors for enzymes of the matrix-metallo-proteinase class. Osteoarthritis, rheumatoid arthritis and metastases can, for instance, be combated by inhibiting the above-mentioned enzymes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07B 57/00; C07C 319/28; C07C 323/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 323/56 (2006.01); C07B 57/00 (2006.01); C07C 319/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 319/28 (2013.01); C07B 57/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 319/28 + C07C 323/56

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849124A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849124 A1 19981105; AR 012440 A1 20001018; AU 730250 B2 20010301; AU 7525198 A 19981124; BG 103776 A 20000531; BR 9809418 A 20000613; CA 2288107 A1 19981105; CN 1253539 A 20000517; CO 4940428 A1 20000724; DE 19717429 A1 19981224; EP 0977717 A1 20000209; HU 0003633 A2 20010328; HU 0003633 A3 20010428; ID 22701 A 19991209; IL 132065 D0 20010319; JP 2001524102 A 20011127; KR 20010020236 A 20010315; NO 994977 A 19991013; NO 994977 D0 19991013; PL 336323 A1 20000619; SK 145999 A3 20000516; TR 9902451 T2 20000421; TW 382622 B 20000221; US 6172259 B1 20010109; ZA 9803473 B 19981029

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-01-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PRODUCTION OF ENANTIOMERICALLY PURE 4-CHLORO-4-OXO-2-PHENYLTHIOMETHYLENEBUTANOIC ACID

2003-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PRODUCTION OF ENANTIOMERICALLY PURE 4-CHLORO-4-OXO-2-PHENYLTHIOMETHYLENEBUTANOIC ACID

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020307

2001-01-31 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DAX

2001-01-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991125

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19991125;LV PAYMENT 19991125;RO PAYMENT 19991125;SI PAYMENT 19991125