Global Patent Index - EP 0977721 A1

EP 0977721 A1 2000-02-09 - SINGLE-STEP METHOD FOR PRODUCING GLYCOL MONOETHERS FROM OLEFINS

Title (en)

SINGLE-STEP METHOD FOR PRODUCING GLYCOL MONOETHERS FROM OLEFINS

Title (de)

EINSTUFIGES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GLYKOLMONOETHERN AUS OLEFINEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE A UNE ETAPE POUR PREPARER DES MONOETHERS GLYCOLIQUES A PARTIR D'OLEFINES

Publication

EP 0977721 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928204 A

Priority

  • DE 19717320 A
  • EP 9802281 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19717320A1] The invention relates to a method for producing glycol monoethers from olefins, wherein said olefins are reacted with an epoxidation reagent in the presence of organic compound containing hydroxyl groups in a mixture of epoxidation catalysts and alkoxylation catalysts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 43/13; B01J 29/00; C07C 41/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 41/06 (2006.01); B01J 29/00 (2006.01); B01J 29/06 (2006.01); B01J 29/42 (2006.01); B01J 29/70 (2006.01); B01J 29/86 (2006.01); B01J 29/89 (2006.01); B01J 37/04 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 41/05 (2006.01); C07C 43/13 (2006.01); B01J 29/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 37/04 (2013.01); B01J 29/005 (2013.01); B01J 29/06 (2013.01); B01J 29/42 (2013.01); B01J 29/7007 (2013.01); B01J 29/86 (2013.01); B01J 29/89 (2013.01); C07C 41/06 (2013.01); B01J 29/40 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 41/06 + C07C 43/13

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847845A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19717320 A1 19981029; AU 8013998 A 19981113; CA 2286340 A1 19981029; CN 1140489 C 20040303; CN 1252784 A 20000510; EP 0977721 A1 20000209; EP 0977721 B1 20020327; ES 2174444 T3 20021101; ID 22629 A 19991202; JP 2002508746 A 20020319; JP 4059927 B2 20080312; MX 211744 B 20021202; MX 9908835 A 20000101; US 2001011148 A1 20010802; US 6239315 B1 20010529; US 6740616 B2 20040525; WO 9847845 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130418

2014-06-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140609

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130417

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803517

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130417

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130417

2013-11-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-11-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131101

2013-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BASF A.G.

- Effective date: 20130430

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120702

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120611

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120501

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174444 T3

2002-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803517 20020502

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010726

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990904

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL