Global Patent Index - EP 0977778 A2

EP 0977778 A2 2000-02-09 - HUMAN NERVE GROWTH FACTOR EXON 1 AND EXON 3 PROMOTERS

Title (en)

HUMAN NERVE GROWTH FACTOR EXON 1 AND EXON 3 PROMOTERS

Title (de)

PROMOTOREN VON EXON 1 UND EXON 3 DES MENSCHLICHEN NERVENWACHSTUMSFAKTORS.

Title (fr)

PROMOTEURS DE L'EXON 1 ET DE L'EXON 3 DU FACTEUR HUMAIN DE CROISSANCE DU TISSU NERVEUX

Publication

EP 0977778 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98901211 A

Priority

  • US 9800396 W
  • US 3821297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9835027A2] Novel human nerve growth factor exon 1 promoter, human nerve growth factor exon 3 promoter, fragments thereof, and modified forms thereof are described. The invention is also directed to vectors containing such promoters, cells transformed with the same, including animal models and transgenic animals containing such sequence and assay methods using these promoters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/48; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); C07K 14/48 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/48 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9835027A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9835027 A2 19980813; WO 9835027 A3 19981203; AU 5734298 A 19980826; CA 2280211 A1 19980813; EP 0977778 A2 20000209; JP 2001521375 A 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LINNIK, MATTHEW, D.

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RACKE, MARGARET, M.

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRAKOWSKY, JOAN, M.

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUBRAMANIAM, ARUN

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990816

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990816;LT PAYMENT 19990816;LV PAYMENT 19990816;MK PAYMENT 19990816;RO PAYMENT 19990816;SI PAYMENT 19990816