Global patent index - EP 0977855 A2

EP 0977855 A2 2000-02-09 - POLYPEPTIDES ASSOCIATED WITH ACTIVATOR RECEPTORS AND THEIR BIOLOGICAL APPLICATIONS

Title (en)

POLYPEPTIDES ASSOCIATED WITH ACTIVATOR RECEPTORS AND THEIR BIOLOGICAL APPLICATIONS

Title (de)

POLYPEPTIDE ASSOZIIERT MIT AKTIVATORREZEPTOREN UND DEREN BIOLOGISCHE ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

POLYPEPTIDES ASSOCIES A DES RECEPTEURS ACTIVATEURS ET LEURS APPLICATIONS BIOLOGIQUES

Publication

EP 0977855 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 98921586 A

Priority

  • FR 9800883 W
  • FR 9705411 A
  • FR 9800927 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849292A2] The invention concerns novel means for diagnosing, preventing, compensating, treating an abnormal or unwanted functioning of KAR receptors (Killer cell Activatory Receptor), counterparts of non-inhibiting KIR receptors (Killer cell Inhibitory Receptors) of the immunoglobulin or lectin type. The invention concerns, in particular, novel KARAP (KAR-Associated Proteins) polypeptides and their biological applications. A KARAP polypeptide is naturally associated with a KAR receptor, and in the absence of such a KARAP, said KAR receptor is naturally incapable of transducing an activating signal that can be detected. The application also concerns methods for obtaining or identifying such KARAP polypeptides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; A61K 39/395; C07K 1/36; C07K 14/705; C07K 16/28; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/577; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/70503 (2013.01); C07K 16/2803 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849292A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849292 A2 19981105; WO 9849292 A3 19990527; CA 2287916 A1 19981105; EP 0977855 A2 20000209; JP 2002503094 A 20020129; JP 2009005699 A 20090115; US 2005130130 A1 20050616; US 7569666 B2 20090804

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20091027

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030704

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030704

2001-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VIVIER, ERIC

2001-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MORETTA, ALESSANDRO

2001-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OLCESE, LUCIA

2001-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VELY, FREDERIC

2001-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TOMASELLO, ELENA

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE