Global Patent Index - EP 0977888 A1

EP 0977888 A1 2000-02-09 - $i(IN VITRO) ANALYSIS FOR DETECTION OF TUMOURS OF THE INTESTINE

Title (en)

$i(IN VITRO) ANALYSIS FOR DETECTION OF TUMOURS OF THE INTESTINE

Title (de)

$i(IN VITRO) NACHWEIS ZUR ERKENNUNG VON DARMTUMOREN

Title (fr)

ANALYSE $i(IN VITRO) PERMETTANT DE DETECTER DES TUMEURS DE L'INTESTIN

Publication

EP 0977888 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912439 A

Priority

  • DE 19711111 A
  • EP 9801223 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19711111A1] The invention relates to in vitro analysis of intraepithelial intestinal bacteria, constituents thereof and reaction products of the host thereon, for detection of tumours of the intestine and the precursors thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/689 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9839473A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19711111 A1 19980917; DE 19711111 C2 19990902; AU 6727598 A 19980922; AU 721826 B2 20000713; CA 2293704 A1 19980911; EP 0977888 A1 20000209; WO 9839473 A1 19980911

INPADOC legal status


2000-11-15 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20000908

2000-07-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: IN VITRO ANALYSIS FOR DETECTION OF TUMOURS OF THE INTESTINE

2000-06-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-05-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: (IN VITRO) ANALYSIS FOR DETECTION OF TUMOURS OF THE INTESTINE

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990915

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19991020