Global Patent Index - EP 0977908 A4

EP 0977908 A4 2000-06-07 - CONDITIONING METAL SURFACES PRIOR TO PHOSPHATE CONVERSION COATING

Title (en)

CONDITIONING METAL SURFACES PRIOR TO PHOSPHATE CONVERSION COATING

Title (de)

KONDITIONIEREN EINER MATALLOBERFLÄCHE VOR DEM PHOSPHATKONVERSIONSBESCHICHTEN

Title (fr)

CONDITIONNEMENT DE SURFACES METALLIQUES PREALABLEMENT A LA PHOSPHATATION

Publication

EP 0977908 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98908792 A

Priority

  • JP 5218197 A
  • US 9803934 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9839498A1] A pretreatment before phosphating conversion coating is effected by contacting a metal substrate to be coated with a pretreatment composition that has a pH from 4 to 13 and contains dispersed fine particle size alkali metal or ammonium salts and divalent or trivalent metal phosphates. The conditioning achieved is as good as with conventional Jernstedt salts and the pretreatment compositions according to the invention are more storage stable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 22/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/07 (2006.01); C23C 22/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/78 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9839498 A1 19980911; AU 6673698 A 19980922; CA 2283387 A1 19980911; CA 2283387 C 20070703; CN 1197849 A 19981104; CN 1198958 C 20050427; DE 69817803 D1 20031009; DE 69817803 T2 20040701; EP 0977908 A1 20000209; EP 0977908 A4 20000607; EP 0977908 B1 20030903; ES 2205456 T3 20040501; ID 20532 A 19990107; JP 3451334 B2 20030929; JP H10245685 A 19980914; MY 124633 A 20060630; TW 371675 B 19991011; ZA 9801796 B 19980907

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090309

2009-10-21 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090811

2009-10-21 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20090811

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080305

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-02-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-12-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

2004-11-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-09-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HENKEL CORPORATION

2004-07-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NIPPON PAINT CO., LTD.

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205456 T3

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69817803 P 20031009

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL CORPORATION

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020613

2000-06-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991006

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT