Global patent index - EP 0977911 A1

EP 0977911 A1 2000-02-09 - PREPARATION OF COPPER-INDIUM-GALLIUM-DISELENIDE PRECURSOR FILMS BY ELECTRODEPOSITION FOR FABRICATING HIGH EFFICIENCY SOLAR CELLS

Title (en)

PREPARATION OF COPPER-INDIUM-GALLIUM-DISELENIDE PRECURSOR FILMS BY ELECTRODEPOSITION FOR FABRICATING HIGH EFFICIENCY SOLAR CELLS

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG VON KUPFER-INDIUM-DISELENIDE-AUSGANGSFOLIEN MITTELS ELEKTROBESCHICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG HOCHEFFIZIENTER SOLARZELLEN

Title (fr)

PREPARATION DE COUCHES D'UN PRECURSEUR CONSTITUE DE DISELENIURE DE CUIVRE-INDIUM-GALLIUM PAR ELECTRODEPOSITION POUR FABRIQUER DES PHOTOPILES A HAUT RENDEMENT

Publication

EP 0977911 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913276 A

Priority

  • US 9806212 W
  • US 4450697 P
  • US 87008197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848079A1] A photovoltaic cell (10) exhibiting an overall conversion efficiency of 13.6 % is prepared from a copper-indium-gallium-diselenide precursor film (18). The film (18) is fabricated by first simultaneously electrodepositing copper, indium, gallium and selenium onto a glass/molybdenum substrate (12/14). The electrodeposition voltage is a high frequency AC voltage superimposed upon a DC voltage to improve the morphology and growth rate of the film (18). The electrodeposition is followed by physical vapor deposition to adjust the final stoichiometry of the thin film (18) to approximately Cu(In1-x,Gax)Se2, with the ratio of Ga/(In+Ga) being approximately 0.39.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 28/02; H01L 21/14; H01L 21/306

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/363 (2006.01); H01L 21/365 (2006.01); H01L 31/032 (2006.01); C25D 3/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/02568 (2013.01); H01L 21/02422 (2013.01); H01L 21/02491 (2013.01); H01L 21/02628 (2013.01); H01L 21/02631 (2013.01); H01L 31/0322 (2013.01); C25D 3/56 (2013.01); Y02E 10/541 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848079 A1 19981029; AU 6786998 A 19981113; CA 2284826 A1 19981029; CA 2284826 C 20070605; EP 0977911 A1 20000209; EP 0977911 A4 20020522

INPADOC legal status

2009-11-06 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025605

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-06-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20070128

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-05-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020408

2002-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 23C 28/02 A, 7H 01L 21/14 B, 7H 01L 21/306 B, 7H 01L 31/032 B, 7C 25D 5/18 B

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991115

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE