Global Patent Index - EP 0977916 A1

EP 0977916 A1 2000-02-09 - ERFAHREN UND ANLAGU

Title (en)

ERFAHREN UND ANLAGU

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN FÄRBEN VON LAUFENDEN GARNEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TEINTURE UNIE EN CONTINU DE FILS EN DEFILEMENT ET INSTALLATION POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0977916 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98910805 A

Priority

FR 9800342 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942646A1] The invention concerns a method for the continuous plain dyeing of unwinding yarns, which essentially consists in unwinding the yarn continuously from one or several supports (1), impregnating (2) it with a dyeing agent, pre-setting (3) said dyeing agent prior to fixing (4) it, optionally washing (10), drying (5) said yarn and rewinding (6) it. The invention also concerns an installation for implementing the method. The method is characterised in that at least one additional expressing (8) and/or impregnating operation is carried out before fixing (4) the dyeing agent. The invention is particularly useful for dyeing textile yarns used in particular on weaving machines or for tufting carpets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 21/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942646A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942646 A1 19990826; EP 0977916 A1 20000209; JP 2001522419 A 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-31 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020610

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020521

2001-06-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUPERBA

2001-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUPERBA

2001-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGIA INTERNATIONAL SA

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991012

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT