Global Patent Index - EP 0977918 A1

EP 0977918 A1 2000-02-09 - A WOOD DELIGNIFICATION CHEMICAL PROCESS USING AMMONIUM MAGNESIUM BISULPHITE AS THE ACTIVE REAGENT

Title (en)

A WOOD DELIGNIFICATION CHEMICAL PROCESS USING AMMONIUM MAGNESIUM BISULPHITE AS THE ACTIVE REAGENT

Title (de)

EIN HOLZDESIGNIFIZIERENDES CHEMISCHES VERFAHREN WOBEI AMMONIUM MAGNISEIUM BISULFIT ALS AKTIVES REAGENZVERWENDET WIRD

Title (fr)

PROCEDE CHIMIQUE DE DELIGNIFICATION DU BOIS UTILISANT COMME REACTIF ACTIF LE BISULFITE D'AMMONIUM ET DE MAGNESIUM

Publication

EP 0977918 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98914170 A

Priority

  • PT 9800002 W
  • PT 10199997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849390A1] The present innovation consists of the use of a reagent solution (FINAL COOKING ACID) where ammonium magnesium bisulphite is the active chemical. This new process is particularly useful to those industrial plants where the cellulose pulp is obtained by the magnesium acid process. The present innovation consists of the introduction of ammonium ions in the cooking acid used in such plants (initial cooking acid). The final cooking acid is obtained by the reaction of the initial cooking acid with ammonium hydroxide. Experimental results show the superiority of the present innovation over the magnesium acid bisulphite pulping process which is expressed by: production of cellulosic fibres with higher mechanico-physical index values; decrease in the percentage of uncooked material; increase in wood yield and less environmental impact.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 3/10; D21C 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 3/10 (2006.01); D21C 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 3/14 (2013.01); D21C 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849390A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849390 A1 19981105; AT 362010 T 20070615; AU 6858698 A 19981124; AU 738720 B2 20010927; BR 9809423 A 20000613; DE 69837755 D1 20070621; DE 69837755 T2 20080131; EP 0977918 A1 20000209; EP 0977918 B1 20070509; PT 101999 A 19981130; PT 101999 B 20030930; US 2002153108 A1 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100421

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100420

2010-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090407

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080420

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080420

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080104

2008-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080212

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071009

2008-01-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-08-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-08-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070820

2007-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69837755 P 20070621

2007-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB LI PT SE

2007-05-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-09 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070509

2007-05-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070509

2007-05-09 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070509

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB LI PT SE