Global Patent Index - EP 0977921 A1

EP 0977921 A1 2000-02-09 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREPARING ASPHALT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREPARING ASPHALT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ASPHALT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PREPARER DE L'ASPHALTE

Publication

EP 0977921 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98920784 A

Priority

  • SE 9800759 W
  • SE 9701552 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849398A1] The invention relates to a device for preparing asphalt, comprising a cylindrical drum (3). The drum is rotatable about its longitudinal axis which is inclined downwards the horizontal plane. The drum has a feeding means (9) arranged at the intake end of the drum and adapted to feed material, in the form of suitable fractions of stone material and/or used asphalt, to the drum; feeding means (15, 17) for supplying a binder; a discharge means (13) arranged at the discharge end of the drum and adapted to discharge prepared asphalt paving material from the drum; a drive means (19) for rotating the drum; a burner (11) arranged at the intake end; and a plurality of carrying means (33) arranged in the drum. The carrying means which extend from the intake end of the drum to the discharge end thereof, receive the material from the feeding means and convey it through the drum. Each carrying means comprises a wall portion (35) which is connected to the wall (41) of the drum and which extends inwards from the wall of the drum, and a groove-shaped portion (37) which is connected to the wall portion and which is terminated with a longitudinal free edge (55), which is arranged at a distance from the wall and in front of the wall portion seen in the direction of rotation of the drum. The carrying means are so designed and mutually arranged that the material in a carrying means (57) during one revolution falls over the edge, is caught by the anteriorly situated carrying means (59), seen in the direction of rotation, and is returned to the carrying means which the material initially left via the drum wall portion (61) of the two neighbouring means. The invention also concerns a corresponding method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/10 (2006.01); F26B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/1031 (2013.01); E01C 19/1036 (2013.01); F26B 11/0477 (2013.01); E01C 2019/1095 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849398A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849398 A1 19981105; AU 7354498 A 19981124; CA 2288111 A1 19981105; EP 0977921 A1 20000209; NO 313422 B1 20020930; NO 995159 A 19991022; NO 995159 D0 19991022; PL 336422 A1 20000619; SE 509095 C2 19981207; SE 9701552 D0 19970425; SE 9701552 L 19981026

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040116

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BENGTSSON, KARL, ARNE

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021001

2000-03-01 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19991025;LV PAYMENT 19991025

2000-02-16 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LV PAYMENT 19991025

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991025

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19991025