Global Patent Index - EP 0977924 A1

EP 0977924 A1 2000-02-09 - DISCHARGE VALVE APPARATUS

Title (en)

DISCHARGE VALVE APPARATUS

Title (de)

ABLAUFVENTIL

Title (fr)

VANNE DE REFOULEMENT

Publication

EP 0977924 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917420 A

Priority

  • GB 9801153 W
  • GB 9708272 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848121A1] The invention relates to discharge valve apparatus for immersion in and discharge of fluid, usually water, from a cistern (not shown) comprising a housing (2), a valve means or piston (3) in the housing (2) for co-operation with an outlet (4) from the housing (2) to prevent flow of fluid from the housing (2) and being movable to open the outlet (4) for flow of fluid therefrom, a pilot valve (5) which is operable to open a free flow between a chamber (6) of the housing (2) and the outlet (4) and means (7) to provide passage of ambient air to the chamber (6), the arrangement being such that with a passage of air being maintained, hydrostatic forces acting on the underside of the valve reduce in proportion to the fluid level fall so that as the fluid falls to a desired level the weight of the valve (3) exceeds the upwards forces whereby to allow the valve to descend and close the outlet (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848121A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848121 A1 19981029; AT 225883 T 20021015; AU 7065398 A 19981113; AU 740241 B2 20011101; DE 69808613 D1 20021114; DE 69808613 T2 20030911; DK 0977924 T3 20030210; EP 0977924 A1 20000209; EP 0977924 B1 20021009; ES 2185163 T3 20030416; GB 9708272 D0 19970618; HU 0003854 A2 20010228; HU 0003854 A3 20010528; NZ 500271 A 20010928; PL 186895 B1 20040331; PL 336467 A1 20000619; PT 977924 E 20030228

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110421

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110421

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100413

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090716 AND 20090722

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DERWENT MAC DEE LTD

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050422

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-11-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-11-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-10-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051021

2005-06-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-04-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-04-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050421

2005-04-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050421

2005-04-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050421

2005-04-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050421

2005-04-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050421

2004-04-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040428

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-19 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040416

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-16 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040416

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-16 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040416

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040415

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-15 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040415

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040408

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040406

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-06 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040406

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-26 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20040326

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-05-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185163 T3

2003-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-02-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400136

2003-02-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808613 20021114

2002-11-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225883 T 20021015

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011221

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE