Global patent index - EP 0977925 A1

EP 0977925 A1 2000-02-09 - METHOD OF INSTALLING A VENTILATION SYSTEM AND DEVICE THEREFOR

Title (en)

METHOD OF INSTALLING A VENTILATION SYSTEM AND DEVICE THEREFOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM INSTALLIEREN EINES LÜFTUNGSSYSTEMS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION D'UN SYSTEME DE VENTILATION ET DISPOSITIF DESTINE A CE SYSTEME DE VENTILATION

Publication

EP 0977925 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98919694 A

Priority

  • SE 9800683 W
  • SE 9701542 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848122A1] A method of installing, and a device in a ventilation system (1) for ventilating rooms defined by structural elements (2) forming the walls, floor and ceiling of the room, and support elements (19) situated therebehind, each structural element having flat extension and comprising joists (15) provided with level-adjusting spacers (21) resting against said underlying support element so that a free space (7) is formed for flowing air, said spaced being coherent for the whole structural element or divided into at least two cells, the space or cells being in open communication with a suction source (4) and with the room via a plurality of supply air ducts (30). According to the invention data relating to parameters of the room and said space or cells, respectively, and of the air flow therein which are of significance to the ventilation are compiled and entered into a computer program to achieve a simulation of the ventilation system, said program then calculating and indicating the optimal positions for said supply air ducts, and that inlet devices forming said supply air ducts are applied in said structural element in agreement with the ventilation system simulated by the computer program.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/00; E04B 5/48; F24F 7/007

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/70 (2006.01); E04B 5/48 (2006.01); F24F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/7092 (2013.01); E04B 1/7069 (2013.01); E04B 5/48 (2013.01); E04F 2015/02061 (2013.01); F24F 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848122A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848122 A1 19981029; AU 7242298 A 19981113; DE 69824171 D1 20040701; EP 0977925 A1 20000209; EP 0977925 B1 20040526; SE 509097 C2 19981207; SE 9701542 D0 19970423; SE 9701542 L 19981024

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-04-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2004-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-08-27 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-08-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69824171

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI GB NL

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NIVELL SYSTEM AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020819

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI GB NL