Global Patent Index - EP 0977929 A1

EP 0977929 A1 2000-02-09 - LOCKING DEVICE

Title (en)

LOCKING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE

Publication

EP 0977929 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915525 A

Priority

  • DE 19807577 A
  • EP 9901019 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807577C1] The invention relates to a locking device comprising at least one key (22) and a locking cylinder (10), which presents at least one cylinder core (11, 12) with a key groove mounted in a rotating manner in a cylinder housing. The locking device is fitted with a locking element (21) which in its locked position prevents the cylinder core from being rotated by means of the key and in its release position allows for the cylinder core to be rotated by means of said key. The invention further provides for an actuator (19) which blocks the locking element in the locked position and releases it in the release position, as well as an electronic code generator (42) in the key and an electronic code evaluator (37), which controls the actuator. The locking cylinder has a cylinder armour-plate comprising an armour-plate (1) housing covering the cylinder housing and an armour-plate disk (6) mounted therein in a rotating manner and having a key insertion slot (7) which is flush with the key groove of the cylinder core. The locking element and the actuator are arranged in the armour-plate housing. In its locked position the locking element engages the armour-plate disk such as to prevent rotation and releases it in the release position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; E05B 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 49/00 (2006.01); E05B 17/14 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/06 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); E05B 15/16 (2006.01); E05B 17/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/063 (2013.01); E05B 17/147 (2013.01); G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); E05B 15/1614 (2013.01); E05B 17/185 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00777 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7079 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7102 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7136 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7921 (2015.04); Y10T 70/8595 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942688A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807577 C1 19990422; AT 247757 T 20030915; BR 9904837 A 20000523; CZ 296590 B6 20060412; CZ 9903713 A3 20000412; EP 0977929 A1 20000209; EP 0977929 B1 20030820; ES 2207196 T3 20040516; HU 0002410 A2 20001128; HU 0002410 A3 20010928; JP 2001522421 A 20011113; JP 3537834 B2 20040614; NO 995162 A 19991222; NO 995162 D0 19991022; PL 190093 B1 20051031; PL 336313 A1 20000619; US 6227020 B1 20010508; WO 9942688 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150219

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150218

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150218

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150218

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150218

2015-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 247757 T

- Effective date: 20150218

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-09-02 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150901

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140109

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140208

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KESO SALZBURG-G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207196 T3

2004-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2003-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: KESO AG

2003-11-20 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-11-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-10-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KESO AG

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2003-08-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-08-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990915

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990915