Global Patent Index - EP 0977930 A2

EP 0977930 A2 2000-02-09 - FRAME SECTION WITH A SUSPENSION ARM OR PROJECTION ARM FOR LAYING A VERTICALLY PIVOTED OR A TILT AND TURN CASEMENT

Title (en)

FRAME SECTION WITH A SUSPENSION ARM OR PROJECTION ARM FOR LAYING A VERTICALLY PIVOTED OR A TILT AND TURN CASEMENT

Title (de)

BESCHLAG MIT TRAGARM ODER AUSSTELLARM ZUR LAGERUNG EINES DREHFLÜGELS ODER DREH-KIPPFLÜGELS

Title (fr)

ARMATURE AVEC BRAS DE SUSPENSION OU BRAS DE PROJECTION POUR LE PLACEMENT D'UN CHASSIS TOURNANT OU D'UN CHASSIS OSCILLANT-BASCULANT DE FENETRE

Publication

EP 0977930 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98922755 A

Priority

  • DE 29707358 U
  • EP 9802346 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2289287A1] The present invention relates to a casement (3) pivoting on a fixed windowframe (2) about only a horizontal axis, but laid non tilting due to a lower corner bearing (5) such as used on frame sections of vertically pivoted or tilt and turn casements, and an upper pivoting bearing (9) linked to the casement window by a suspension arm (11) which is enough flexible upwardly to follow the vertical movements made at the corner bearing (5). Owing to a guiding member (29a) engaging into the groove of the casement (3), the suspension arm is guided upwards and backed against movements perpendicular to the casement plane. To enable a right-left inversion the suspension arm (11) is connected to a pivoting bearing (9) through a bearing (69) turning about a horizontal axis and having a spring effect radially oriented in such a way as to enable a locking projection (77, 78) to be engaged in locking wells (75, 76) specially provided, or released therefrom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/52 (2006.01); E05D 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/5205 (2013.01); E05D 7/02 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5357 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5547 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848136A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29707358 U1 19980827; AT 214776 T 20020415; AT 236330 T 20030415; CA 2289287 A1 19981029; CA 2289287 C 20020409; EP 0977930 A2 20000209; EP 0977930 B1 20020320; EP 1085155 A2 20010321; EP 1085155 A3 20020116; EP 1085155 B1 20030402; ES 2174435 T3 20021101; ES 2192513 T3 20031016; US 2002023396 A1 20020228; US 6286262 B1 20010911; US 6772480 B2 20040810; WO 9848136 A2 19981029; WO 9848136 A3 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803432

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120421

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 214776 T

- Effective date: 20120421

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120507

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110414

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080421

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060422

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-04-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060422

2006-04-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060421

2005-04-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERCO INTERNATIONAL FERRURES ET SERRURES DE BATIM

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-04-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030425

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030425

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030416

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174435 T3

2002-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803432 20020425

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214776 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FERCO INTERNATIONAL FERRURES ET SERRURES DE BATIME

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991117

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL