Global patent index - EP 0977931 A1

EP 0977931 A1 2000-02-09 - MULTIZONE PRODUCTION MONITORING SYSTEM

Title (en)

MULTIZONE PRODUCTION MONITORING SYSTEM

Title (de)

ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR MEHRZONEN-PRODUKTION

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE DE PRODUCTION MULTIZONE

Publication

EP 0977931 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98919833 A

Priority

  • US 9808066 W
  • US 4453897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848145A1] In a multiple connected well, spaced apart production packers (26a-D) isolate independent zones (15-18) from one another. In each isolated production zone, a side pocket mandrel (30) with a full opening bore (40A) has lengthwise extending side by side pockets (40B, 40C, 40D) for receiving a static pressure measurement instrument or tool (90); for providing an elongated pressure differential flow passageway; and for receiving a differential pressure measuring tool (74). Fluid flow in the production zone is channelled through the flow passageway to the full opening bore (40A) and the fluid is communicated to the static pressure measuring tool (90) and to the differential pressure tool (74). The static pressure and differential pressure of the fluid flow from each production zone is independently measured at the time of production and sequentially and repetitively read out at the earth's surface. From the pressure measurements and flow equations, the production flow is determined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 47/06; E21B 23/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 23/03 (2006.01); E21B 47/06 (2012.01); E21B 47/10 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/10 (2013.01); E21B 23/03 (2013.01); E21B 47/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848145 A1 19981029; CA 2286758 A1 19981029; EP 0977931 A1 20000209; EP 0977931 A4 20000628; EP 0977931 B1 20040818; NO 319986 B1 20051010; NO 995215 A 19991118; NO 995215 D0 19991025

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-08-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050408

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-08-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040818

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020729

2000-06-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 21B 47/06 A, 7E 21B 23/03 B, 7E 21B 47/10 B

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991117

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB