Global Patent Index - EP 0977944 A1

EP 0977944 A1 2000-02-09 - A FUEL INJECTION PUMP FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES, IN PARTICULAR BIG, SLOW MARINE DIESEL ENGINES

Title (en)

A FUEL INJECTION PUMP FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES, IN PARTICULAR BIG, SLOW MARINE DIESEL ENGINES

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZPUMPE FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN, INSBESONDERE LANGSAMLAUFENDE GROSSDIESELMOTOREN FÜR DIE SCHIFFAHRT

Title (fr)

POMPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE, EN PARTICULIER DE GROS MOTEURS DIESEL LENTS FONCTIONNANT EN MILIEU MARIN

Publication

EP 0977944 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98916865 A

Priority

  • DK 9800149 W
  • DK 44397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848166A1] A fuel injection pump for internal combustion engines, in particular big, slow marine diesel engines, for supply of a variable amount of fuel to an injection nozzle positioned in the working cylinder of the engine, said injection nozzle having a spring-loaded needle in the nozzle aperture, and which pump comprises a barrel (2), in which a plunger (3) with an upper edge (4) formed between the end surface and the side surface of the plunger and at least one helically extending oblique cut-off edge (6), is movable, which oblique cut-off edge (6) defines a recess (5) in the side surface of the plunger, which recess is connected through an axial duct (9) with the end surface of the plunger, and in which the wall of the barrel (2) has at least one cut-off hole (11), which opens into a surrounding supply chamber containing the fuel under moderate pressure, said at least one hole at the travel of the plunger from the bottom to the top position being covered by the side surface of the plunger below the upper edge and being later uncovered by the oblique cut-off edge for diversion of excess fuel at the end of the effective pump stroke. To overcome problems due to erosion and pressure oscillation in pumps of big dimensions, the pumps are designed such that at least one of the cut-off holes (11) contains a flow limiting means (13) placed at a distance from the wall of the barrel, said means defining a chamber (20) positioned between the cylindrical wall of the barrel (2) and the flow-limiting means.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/44; F02M 59/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/26 (2006.01); F02M 59/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/265 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848166A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848166 A1 19981029; AU 7030298 A 19981113; CN 1081740 C 20020327; CN 1252854 A 20000510; DE 69805999 D1 20020718; DE 69805999 T2 20021128; DK 176162 B1 20061023; DK 44397 A 19981022; EP 0977944 A1 20000209; EP 0977944 B1 20020612; IT 1299426 B1 20000316; IT RM980248 A1 19991020; IT RM980248 D0 19980420; JP 2001520719 A 20011030; JP 3588365 B2 20041110; KR 100440828 B1 20040719

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69805999 20020718

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010615

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990923

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL