Global Patent Index - EP 0977964 A1

EP 0977964 A1 2000-02-09 - CONTINUOUS-FLOW STEAM GENERATOR AND METHOD FOR STARTING SAME

Title (en)

CONTINUOUS-FLOW STEAM GENERATOR AND METHOD FOR STARTING SAME

Title (de)

DURCHLAUFDAMPFERZEUGER UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANFAHREN EINES DURCHLAUFDAMPFERZEUGERS

Title (fr)

GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR A FLUX CONTINU ET SON PROCEDE DE DEMARRAGE

Publication

EP 0977964 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98931919 A

Priority

  • DE 9801055 W
  • DE 19717158 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19717158A1] The invention relates to a continuous-flow steam generator (1) designed in a two-pass construction style. A second gas pass (14) is connected downstream from a first gas pass (8) on the side of the heating gas via a horizontal gas pass (12). In a steam generator (1) of this kind, which should have a particularly long service life even if it is frequently started, a number of parallel-connected steam generating pipes (16) for a fluid medium to flow through are interconnected giving an evaporator heating surface (22) which is part of an encompassing wall (6) of the first gas pass (8). The steam-generating pipes (16) forming the evaporator heating surface (22) discharge on the output side into a common outlet collector (24) which is fitted at low height in relation to an under edge (44) of the horizontal gas pass (12). A bulkhead heating surface (26) is connected downstream from the outlet collector (24), on the side of the fluid medium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 29/06; F22B 35/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 29/06 (2006.01); F22B 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 29/06 (2013.01); F22B 29/062 (2013.01); F22B 35/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848217A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19717158 A1 19981105; DE 19717158 C2 19991111; CA 2287177 A1 19981029; CN 1126905 C 20031105; CN 1249807 A 20000405; DK 0977964 T3 20021230; EP 0977964 A1 20000209; EP 0977964 B1 20020828; RU 2188357 C2 20020827; US 6192837 B1 20010227; WO 9848217 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070414

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070414

2007-12-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-06-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060619

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-12-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805320 20021002

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI SE

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020828

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991019

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI SE