Global Patent Index - EP 0977971 A1

EP 0977971 A1 2000-02-09 - FITTED COOLING DEVICE

Title (en)

FITTED COOLING DEVICE

Title (de)

EINBAUKÄLTEGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL FRIGORIFIQUE ENCASTRE

Publication

EP 0977971 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907466 A

Priority

  • DE 19803999 A
  • EP 9900627 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19803999A1] The invention relates to a fitted cooling device comprising a heat-insulated housing (10) and at least one heat-insulated door (11), both of which at least have components made of a metallic material. According to the invention those sections of the outer areas (14) of the elements made of metallic material which are visible when the device has been installed are fitted with a layer (19) which is in a decorative finished state whereas the remaining sections (15, 16, 17), which are not visible after installation of the device, have a basic coating (20) serving as rust protection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939141A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19803999 A1 19990805; DE 59907421 D1 20031127; EP 0977971 A1 20000209; EP 0977971 B1 20031022; ES 2211049 T3 20040701; HU 0003795 A2 20010428; HU 0003795 A3 20010628; HU 221995 B1 20030328; PL 192388 B1 20061031; PL 335969 A1 20000605; TR 9902392 T1 20000921; WO 9939141 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59907421

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2211049

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907421

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

SI

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020412

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990907

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19990907