Global Patent Index - EP 0977985 A4

EP 0977985 A4 2000-08-30 - METHOD OF DETERMINING THREE-DIMENSIONAL PROTEIN STRUCTURE FROM PRIMARY PROTEIN SEQUENCE

Title (en)

METHOD OF DETERMINING THREE-DIMENSIONAL PROTEIN STRUCTURE FROM PRIMARY PROTEIN SEQUENCE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR FESTSTELLUNG DER DREIDIMENSIONALEN EIWEISSSTRUHTEN AUS EINERPRIMÄREN EIWEISSSEQUENZ

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE LA STRUCTURE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE D'UNE PROTEINE A PARTIR D'UNE SEQUENCE PRIMAIRE DE CETTE PROTEINE

Publication

EP 0977985 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98918562 A

Priority

  • US 9808077 W
  • US 4412497 P
  • US 6294898 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/00; C07K 5/06; G06F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 5/06 (2006.01); G01N 33/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/00 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EVANS, JOHN SPENCER ET AL: "Prediction of polyelectrolyte polypeptide structures using Monte Carlo conformational search methods with implicit solvation modeling", PROTEIN SCI. (1995), 4(10), 2019-31, 1995, XP000915632
  • [X] MATHIOWETZ, ALAN M. ET AL: "Building proteins from C.alpha. coordinates using the dihedral probability grid Monte Carlo method", PROTEIN SCI. (1995), 4(6), 1217-32, 1995, XP000915630
  • [X] EVANS, JOHN SPENCER ET AL: "De novo prediction of polypeptide conformations using dihedral probability grid Monte Carlo methodology", PROTEIN SCI. (1995), 4(6), 1203-16, 1995, XP000915634
  • [LX] DEBE, DEREK A. ET AL: "Protein Fold Determination from Sparse Distance Restraints: The Restraine Generic Protein Direct Monte Carlo Method", J. PHYS. CHEM. B (1999), 103(15), 3001-3008, 1999, XP000915733
  • [LX] DEBE, DEREK A. ET AL: "The topomer-sampling model of protein folding", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A. (1999), 96(6), 2596-2601, 1999, XP000910234
  • See also references of WO 9848270A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0977985 A1 20000209; EP 0977985 A4 20000830

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030923

2000-08-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01N 33/00 A, 7G 06F 17/00 B, 7C 07K 5/06 B

2000-06-29 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2000-04-21 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991119

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI