Global patent index - EP 0977988 A1

EP 0977988 A1 2000-02-09 - HOMOGENEOUS FLUORESCENCE ASSAY FOR MEASURING THE EFFECT OF COMPOUNDS ON GENE EXPRESSION

Title (en)

HOMOGENEOUS FLUORESCENCE ASSAY FOR MEASURING THE EFFECT OF COMPOUNDS ON GENE EXPRESSION

Title (de)

HOMOGENER FLUORESZENZTEST ZUR MESSUNG DES EFFEKTES VON VERBINDUNGEN AUF DIE GENEXPRESSION

Title (fr)

TEST PAR FLUORESCENCE HOMOGENE POUR MESURER L'EFFET DES COMPOSES SUR L'EXPRESSION D'UN GENE

Publication

EP 0977988 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98920866 A

Priority

  • US 9808101 W
  • US 4452797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848274A1] Invented is a fluorescence reporter assay system that requires no washing or cell lysis steps, is capable of time resolved fluorescence detection and is suitable for multiplexing. Also invented is a method of conducting high throughput screening using the presently invented fluorescence reporter assay system. Also invented is a method of screening combinatorial libraries using the presently invented fluorescence reporter assay system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/53; C12N 15/00; G01N 33/536

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/533 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6897 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848274 A1 19981029; CA 2287427 A1 19981029; EP 0977988 A1 20000209; EP 0977988 A4 20040630; JP 2002511744 A 20020416

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-06-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040518

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991012

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL