Global Patent Index - EP 0977996 A1

EP 0977996 A1 2000-02-09 - ANALYSIS SYSTEM AND ANALYSIS DEVICE

Title (en)

ANALYSIS SYSTEM AND ANALYSIS DEVICE

Title (de)

ANALYSESYSTEM UND ANALYSEGERÄT

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET APPAREIL D'ANALYSE

Publication

EP 0977996 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908931 A

Priority

  • DE 19807177 A
  • EP 9901092 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942841A1] The invention relates to an analysis system, especially for use in medicine for carrying out clinical chemistry and immunological analyses, comprising an analysis device (1) and at least one system reagent carrier (2; 102). The analysis device comprises at least one rotor (12) which can be driven in a controlled rotating manner, first receiving elements (32, 38) for reagent vessels, second receiving elements for sample vessels (40), a lifting and swivelling device (18) which can be driven in a controlled manner, moved towards and away from the rotor along a swivel path and is fitted with a pipetting device (16), a washing station (43) for the pipetting device, a detecting device (20) and a control device (22) for controlling the rotor drive, the drive of the lifting and swivelling device and the operation of the pipetting device and detecting device. At least one sample vessel can be positioned along the swivel path of the pipetting device. The system reagent carrier contains at least one cuvette (44', 44''; 144', 144'', 144''') prefilled with a test-specific, preformulated, wet chemical system reagent (45', 45'') as well as the measuring cuvette (44; 144).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 35/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/48 (2006.01); G01N 35/00 (2006.01); G01N 35/02 (2006.01); G01N 35/04 (2006.01); G01N 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 35/025 (2013.01); G01N 35/00732 (2013.01); G01N 2035/00772 (2013.01); G01N 2035/0436 (2013.01); G01N 2035/1088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942841A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942841 A1 19990826; AU 2835199 A 19990906; AU 766654 B2 20031023; BR 9904832 A 20000523; CA 2287364 A1 19990826; CN 101364276 A 20090211; CN 101364276 B 20130206; CN 1124489 C 20031015; CN 1266489 A 20000913; DE 19807177 A1 19990916; EP 0977996 A1 20000209; EP 0977996 B1 20130515; EP 2261675 A2 20101215; EP 2261675 A3 20140416; HU 0102743 A2 20011128; HU 0102743 A3 20020228; ID 23862 A 20000525; JP 2002503346 A 20020129; JP 4081146 B2 20080423; KR 20010020145 A 20010315; KR 20010020146 A 20010315; PL 336303 A1 20000619; TR 199902616 T1 20000522; TW 521206 B 20030221; TW I234657 B 20050621; US 6375898 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59915378

- Effective date: 20140218

2014-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140218

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130515

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130826

2013-10-30 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20130515

2013-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI AND CO. PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2013-07-04 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 59915378

- Effective date: 20130704

2013-06-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 612409 T

- Effective date: 20130615

2013-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2013-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2013-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HITACHI CHEMICAL COMPANY, LTD.

2006-09-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025632

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-03-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA HITACHI SEISAKUSHO(HITACHI, LTD.)

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: START DIAGNOSTICS AG

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: START DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991105

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL