Global patent index - EP 0978113 A1

EP 0978113 A1 2000-02-09 - DEVICE FOR CHANGING ADVERTISING POSTERS IN ADVERTISING PILLARS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CHANGING ADVERTISING POSTERS IN ADVERTISING PILLARS

Title (de)

WECHSELVORRICHTUNG FÜR WERBEPLAKATE IN WERBESÄULEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF INVERSEUR POUR AFFICHES PUBLICITAIRES DANS DES COLONNES PUBLICITAIRES

Publication

EP 0978113 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98920535 A

Priority

  • DE 29707187 U
  • EP 9802249 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848400A1] In order to increase the defined size of the advertising surface in a change-over device for advertising posters the invention provides a device for use in advertising pillars having a round or polygonal shape and window surfaces embodied in same pillars. Said device comprises an elliptical hollow body (10) having advertising posters (20, 21) suspended on the two opposite lateral surfaces (11, 12) of said hollow body. One of the advertising posters (20) faces the viewer while the other poster faces away from the viewer and is turned towards the inside of the advertising pillar (50). Along its centre axis (13) the hollow body (10) is attached to a rotating drive (15) which is mounted on a linear sliding carriage (16) the direction of displacement of which extends through the centre axis of the advertising pillar (50). At its outer end (10a) the hollow body (10) has a guide roller (30) which moves in a constrained guide track (35) in a manner corresponding to the shape of the wall of the advertising pillar (50).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/0081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848400A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29707187 U1 19970612; AU 7335798 A 19981113; DE 19880528 D2 20000907; EP 0978113 A1 20000209; EP 0978113 B1 20011107; PE 70199 A1 19990812; PL 336528 A1 20000703; WO 9848400 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-09-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020530

2002-05-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20011107

2002-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-02-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802066

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-13

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI PT

2001-11-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI PT