Global Patent Index - EP 0978116 A1

EP 0978116 A1 2000-02-09 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECORDING IN CYCLIC LOOPS SEVERAL SOUND SEQUENCES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECORDING IN CYCLIC LOOPS SEVERAL SOUND SEQUENCES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SPEICHERUNG VON TONFOLGEN IN CYCLISCHEN SCHLEIFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'ENREGISTREMENT EN BOUCLES CYCLIQUES DE PLUSIEURS SEQUENCES PHONIQUES

Publication

EP 0978116 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97937616 A

Priority

  • FR 9701477 W
  • FR 9610109 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2752323A1] The invention concerns a method and a device for recording in cyclic loops several sound sequences, for their simultaneous reproduction, by means of a device using sampled sound signals and comprising a memory (103), a unit (101) for controlling the memory (103) and means for reproducing sounds. The method consists the following steps: triggering loops with default values, so that they function substantially permanently with the desired values in terms of a tempo common to all the loops, of the number of desired measures in each of said loops and of the sample frequency; recording the sound signals for at least one predetermined loop.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10H 1/0033 (2013.01); G10H 2250/641 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9807140A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2752323 A1 19980213; FR 2752323 B1 19980918; AU 4018197 A 19980306; CA 2263365 A1 19980219; CA 2263365 C 20110419; DE 69732797 D1 20050421; DE 69732797 T2 20060112; EP 0978116 A1 20000209; EP 0978116 B1 20050316; US 2003171933 A1 20030911; WO 9807140 A1 19980219

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150805

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150522

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110811

2012-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PERILLE, EMMANUEL

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100830

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2006-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051219

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050627

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69732797 P 20050421

2005-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2005-01-26 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-03 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-09-15 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990113

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI