Global Patent Index - EP 0978221 A1

EP 0978221 A1 2000-02-09 - CIRCUITRY FOR DIMMING A FLUORESCENT LAMP

Title (en)

CIRCUITRY FOR DIMMING A FLUORESCENT LAMP

Title (de)

SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM DIMMBAREN BETRIEB EINER LEUCHTSTOFFLAMPE

Title (fr)

CIRCUITERIE POUR FONCTIONNEMENT MODULABLE D'UN TUBE FLUORESCENT

Publication

EP 0978221 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924143 A

Priority

  • DE 19717309 A
  • DE 19733939 A
  • EP 9802290 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848597A1] The invention relates to a circuitry for dimming a fluorescent lamp with an operating frequency (f1), comprising a device for connecting and disconnecting the operating frequency (f1) with a dimming frequency (f2), wherein the pulse width (W2) of the dimming frequency (f2) can be adjusted and f2 < than f1. The invention provides for simultaneous adjustment of the fluorescent lamp voltage though the device by connecting or disconnecting the distribution voltage with a switching frequency (f3) having an adjustable pulse width (W3), wherein f3 > f1.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/392 (2006.01); H05B 37/00 (2006.01); H05B 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2822 (2013.01); H05B 41/3927 (2013.01); Y10S 315/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848597A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848597 A1 19981029; EP 0978221 A1 20000209; EP 0978221 B1 20041222; JP 2002511181 A 20020409; JP 4116092 B2 20080709; US 6351080 B1 20020226

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100417

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100417

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050223

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812414

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991027

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB