Global patent index - EP 0978248 A3

EP 0978248 A3 2001-01-03 - Toilet seat for children

Title (en)

Toilet seat for children

Title (de)

Toilettensitz für Kinder

Title (fr)

Siège de toilettes pour enfants

Publication

EP 0978248 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115603 A

Priority

DE 29814176 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978248A2] The toilet seat consists of a rim and a lid (12,11) which are connected together via a hinge (15). A further annular toilet rim (13) is provided between the lid and the first rim, having a smaller opening than the first rim. The second rim is also held by the hinge. The second rim has knobs (18) on its underside for supporting the first toilet rim.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 13/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814176 U1 19990204; EP 0978248 A2 20000209; EP 0978248 A3 20010103

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI