Global patent index - EP 0978249 A3

EP 0978249 A3 2000-11-15 - Apparatus for treating surfaces

Title (en)

Apparatus for treating surfaces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Behandeln von Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Appareil de traitement de surfaces

Publication

EP 0978249 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115322 A

Priority

DE 19835185 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978249A2] The floor cleaning or polishing device has an electric motor (2) used for driving at least 2 horizontal rotating sections (3), e.g. brushes or drive plates, in opposite directions. The motor and the rotating sections respectively positioned on the upper and lower sides of a carrier plate (1) provided with a pivoted handle (5) which is free to move in all directions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 11/16; A47L 11/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/4038 (2013.01); A47L 11/16 (2013.01); A47L 11/4069 (2013.01); A47L 11/4075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978249 A2 20000209; EP 0978249 A3 20001115; DE 19835185 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040302

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47L 11/16 A, 7A 47L 11/40 B

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI