Global Patent Index - EP 0978261 A1

EP 0978261 A1 2000-02-09 - Knee joint prosthesis with spinout prevention

Title (en)

Knee joint prosthesis with spinout prevention

Title (de)

Kniegelenkprothese mit Luxationsverhinderung

Title (fr)

Prothèse d'articulation de genou avec empêchement de luxation

Publication

EP 0978261 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99115515 A

Priority

US 9538298 P

Abstract (en)

A knee joint prosthesis is provided. The prosthesis includes a femoral component for mounting to the distal end of a femur, a tibial component for mounting to the resected proximal end of the tibia and a bearing disposed between the femoral and tibial components. The tibial component includes a superior bearing surface with a recess extending distally into the bearing surface. The bearing includes an inferior bearing surface for engagement on the superior bearing surface of the tibial component. Additionally, the bearing includes a projection that is rotatably engaged in the recess of the tibial component. Rotation of the bearing relative to the tibial component is limited by a stop extending from the superior bearing surface of the tibial component. The stop is engaged in a slot formed in the inferior surface of the bearing. The slot is concentric about the rotational axis and extends through an arc consistent with the desired maximum range of rotation. Engagement of the stop in the slot limits rotation and prevents spinout of the knee prosthesis. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/3868 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978261 A1 20000209; EP 0978261 B1 20031126; CA 2279660 A1 20000205; CA 2279660 C 20040224; DE 69913048 D1 20040108; DE 69913048 T2 20040916; JP 2000152949 A 20000606; JP 4716535 B2 20110706; US 6238434 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160802

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130805

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120805

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120805

2013-05-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120805

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120811

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69913048

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2003-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020814

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IE IT

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI