Global patent index - EP 0978300 A1

EP 0978300 A1 2000-02-09 - Method of manufacturing a figure for a table football game, figure thus obtained and table football game provided with such a figure

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing a figure for a table football game, figure thus obtained and table football game provided with such a figure

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Figur für ein Tischfussballspiel, danach hergestellte Figur und mit solch einer Figur ausgerüstetes Tischfussballspiel

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une figurine pour jeu de table du type baby-foot, figurine ainsi obtenue et jeu de table pourvu d'une telle figurine

Publication

EP 0978300 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420177 A

Priority

FR 9810228 A

Abstract (en)

The procedure consists of moulding the figure in two hinged halves (A, B), each with a recess (6A, 6B) to receive one side of a supporting rod (10). The halves are fitted together on either side of the rod and fixed with a screw, clip or locking ring in the shape of boots or a jersey which can be made in a variety of colours. The halves can be solid with flat meeting surfaces or hollow, requiring less material.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une figurine pour jeu de table de type baby-foot, caractérisé en ce qu'il consiste à : mouler à plat deux demi-corps (A, B) pourvus chacun d'un logement (6A, 6B) de réception partielle d'une tige (10) de support de ladite figurine ; disposer lesdits demi-corps de part et d'autre de ladite tige (10) de telle sorte que ladite tige est reçue dans les logements (6A, 6B) en regard desdits demi-corps (A, B) et verrouiller (F) lesdits demi-corps ensemble en emprisonnant ladite tige (10) dans lesdits logements (6A, 6B). La figurine est caractérisée en ce qu'elle comprend deux demi-corps (A, B) verrouillés ensemble autour de la tige de support (10), ces demi-corps définissant entre eux un logement (6) de réception et d'emprisonnement de la tige. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 7/06 (2006.01); A63F 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 7/0676 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978300 A1 20000209; FR 2782016 A1 20000211; FR 2782016 B1 20000915

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020920

2001-06-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROUPE BERCHET

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-02-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A FIGURE FOR A TABLE FOOTBALL GAME, FIGURE THUS OBTAINED AND TABLE FOOTBALL GAME PROVIDED WITH SUCH A FIGURE

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI