Global Patent Index - EP 0978309 A1

EP 0978309 A1 2000-02-09 - Mixing device

Title (en)

Mixing device

Title (de)

Mischer

Title (fr)

Mélangeur

Publication

EP 0978309 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202339 A

Priority

GB 9816707 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a mixing device (10) for mixing inter-reactive fluids comprising a generally cylindrical vessel having a stirring device (20, 22) rotatable about the central axis thereof. When the stirring device is rotated about said central axis the resulting mixing and turbulence of the fluid contained within the vessel is such that radial displacement of any particle of fluid is minimised as compared with displacements perpendicular to the radius. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/08 (2006.01); B01F 5/00 (2006.01); B01F 7/16 (2006.01); B01F 7/18 (2006.01); B01F 15/02 (2006.01); G03C 1/00 (2006.01); G03C 1/015 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/0853 (2013.01); B01F 3/0807 (2013.01); B01F 5/0068 (2013.01); B01F 7/162 (2013.01); B01F 7/18 (2013.01); B01F 15/0272 (2013.01); G03C 1/015 (2013.01); B01F 2015/00597 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

G03C 1/015 + G03C 2200/09

Citation (search report)

[AD] EP 0734761 A2 19961002 - KODAK LTD [GB], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978309 A1 20000209; EP 0978309 B1 20030409; DE 69906641 D1 20030515; DE 69906641 T2 20040304; GB 9816707 D0 19980930; JP 2000093778 A 20000404

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080715

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080715

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070706

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020322

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI