Global Patent Index - EP 0978323 A2

EP 0978323 A2 2000-02-09 - Paint roller body

Title (en)

Paint roller body

Title (de)

Walzenkörper für einen Farbroller

Title (fr)

Support cylindrique pour rouleau à peindre

Publication

EP 0978323 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112253 A

Priority

DE 19835460 A

Abstract (en)

The inside of the tubular body (3) has stops (5,6) for engaging in the bearings of the roller handle. The stops have at least one protrusion which interacts with a stop flank around the bearings. One or more stop elements are each only partly formed over the circumference of the inside wall of the tubular body and are dimensioned so that their shape can be defined by mandrel elements which can be drawn axially out of the opposite end sides of the tubular body.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Walzenkörper für einen Farbroller mit einem Rohrkörper vorgeschlagen, wobei zur drehbaren Aufnahme und Arretierung eines Farbrollerbügels innerhalb des Rohrkörpers Anschlagmittel vorgesehen sind, die im Rohrkörper drehbar eingerastete Lagermittel des Farbrollerbügels gegen eine Verschiebung entlang der Rohrkörperachse sichern. Erfindungsgemäß umfassen die Anschlagmittel ein oder mehrere Anschlagelement/e (5, 6) bestehend aus wenigstens einer Erhebung, die jeweils mit einer an den Anschlagmitteln umlaufenden Anschlagflanke zusammenwirken, wobei das eine oder die mehreren Anschlagelement/e jeweils nur teilweise über den Umfang der Innenwandung des Rohrkörpers (3) ausgebildet ist/sind, und wobei das eine oder die mehreren Anschlagelement/e derart an der Rohrinnenwandung dimensioniert und angeordnet ist/sind, daß ihre Form durch Dornelemente definiert werden kann, die in axialer Richtung aus gegenüberliegenden Stirnseiten des Rohrkörpers herausziehbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978323 A2 20000209; EP 0978323 A3 20010110; EP 0978323 B1 20061129; AT 346696 T 20061215; DE 19835460 A1 20000210; DE 59914018 D1 20070111; DK 0978323 T3 20070402; ES 2278425 T3 20070801

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080626

2010-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090106

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080626

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080626

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-03-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-02-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2278425 T3

2007-07-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070706

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: CIRET GMBH

2007-07-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: FIA GMBH

2007-07-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CIRET GMBH

- Effective date: 20070516

2007-06-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070613

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2007-05-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: CIRET GMBH

- Free text: FIA FARBWERKZEUG GMBH & CO. KG#PETER-DOERFLER-STRASSE 32#D-88239 WANGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CIRET GMBH#KARL-MAYBACH-STRASSE 18#88239 WANGEN (DE)

2007-05-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-05-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CIRET GMBH

2007-05-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: FIA WTI GMBH

2007-04-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2007-03-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914018 P 20070111

2006-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-12-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061129

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2006-11-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010505

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI